US HB2539 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses threat information sharing and law enforcement training regarding the enhancement of security for surface transportation assets. (A surface transportation asset includes facilities, equipment, or systems used to provide transportation services by a public transportation carrier, railroad carrier, or an entity offering scheduled, fixed-route transportation services by bus.) Specifically, the bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to prioritize the assignment of officers and intelligence analysts from the Transportation Security Administration and the Office of Intelligence and Analysis to locations with participating state, local, and regional fusion centers in jurisdictions with high-risk surface transportation assets to enhance the security of such assets, including by improving timely sharing of classified information regarding terrorist and other threats; and authorizes DHS to develop a training program to enhance the protection, preparedness, and response capabilities of law enforcement agencies with respect to terrorist and other threats at a surface transportation asset.
Title
Strengthening Local Transportation Security Capabilities Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 243 (Y: 384 N: 13 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-06-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 13 (Roll no. 243). (text: CR H4369) |
2019-06-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4376) |
2019-06-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-06-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2539. |
2019-06-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4369-4370) |
2019-06-10 | House | Miss Rice (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 68. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-93. |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Criminal justice information and records
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Motor carriers
Public transit
Railroads
Roads and highways
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Motor carriers
Public transit
Railroads
Roads and highways
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security