US HB255 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to convey 73 acres of identified Forest Service land to the County of San Bernardino, California, in exchange for approximately 71 acres of identified land owned by the county. Before completing the exchange, USDA must relocate the portion of the Pacific Crest National Scenic Trail that is located on the federal land to (1) adjacent National Forest System land; (2) land owned by the county, subject to county approval; (3) land within the federal land, subject to county approval; or (4) a combination of any of these.
Title
Big Bear Land Exchange Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9074) |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 255. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9074-9075) |
2019-11-20 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 98. |
2019-06-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-134. |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
California
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources