US HB2569 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 119-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. Carolyn B. Maloney (NY) asked unanimous consent that she hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 2569, a bill originally introduced by Representative Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. Carolyn B. Maloney (NY) asked unanimous consent that she hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 2569, a bill originally introduced by Representative Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes various programs to address substance use disorder and opioid addiction, including grants for treatment, recovery, and harm reduction services as well as a program to distribute overdose reversal drugs.
Title
Comprehensive Addiction Resources Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. Carolyn B. Maloney (NY) asked unanimous consent that she hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 2569, a bill originally introduced by Representative Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1365 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Indian social and development programs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Women's health
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Indian social and development programs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2569/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2569/BILLS-116hr2569ih.pdf |