US HB2577 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to include all perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, commonly referred to as PFAS, in the Toxic Release Inventory of chemicals. PFAS are man-made and may have adverse human health effects. A variety of products contain the compounds, such as nonstick cookware or weatherproof clothing. Certain industrial facilities that manufacture, process, or use PFAS must annually report to the EPA on their PFAS releases, which will be included in the Toxic Release Inventory.
Title
PFAS Right-To-Know Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2577/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2577/BILLS-116hr2577ih.pdf |