US HB259 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid Extenders Act of 2019 This bill alters several Medicaid programs and funding mechanisms. (Sec. 2) The bill makes appropriations for FY2019 for, and otherwise revises, the Money Follows the Person Rebalancing Demonstration Program. (Under this program, the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must award grants to state Medicaid programs to assist states in increasing the use of home and community care for long-term care and decreasing the use of institutional care.) (Sec. 3) Additionally, the bill temporarily extends the applicability of Medicaid eligibility criteria that protect against spousal impoverishment for recipients of home and community-based services. (Sec. 4) The bill reduces the federal medical assistance percentage (i.e., federal matching rate) for states that have not implemented asset-verification programs for determining Medicaid eligibility. (Sec. 5) The bill also reduces funding available to the Medicaid Improvement Fund beginning in FY2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Extenders Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-3.
2019-01-24SenateSigned by President.
2019-01-23SenatePresented to President.
2019-01-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-01-17SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S297)
2019-01-09SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-01-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H235)
2019-01-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 259.
2019-01-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H234-237)
2019-01-08HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-01-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB21 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 5.
HB648 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
HR61 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB260 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback