US HB2590 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jul 24 @ 9:30 am in SD-342
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

DHS Overseas Personnel Enhancement Act of 2019 This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to semiannually brief the congressional homeland security committees regarding DHS personnel with primary duties that take place outside of the United States. DHS must submit to such committees a plan to enhance the effectiveness of DHS personnel at foreign locations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS Overseas Personnel Enhancement Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 244 (Y: 394 N: 2 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-06-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 2 (Roll no. 244). (text: CR H4373-4374)
2019-06-10HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4377)
2019-06-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-06-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2590.
2019-06-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4373-4375)
2019-06-10HouseMr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 70.
2019-05-30HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-95.
2019-05-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-05-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback