US HB2591 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing the Pittman-Robertson Fund for Tomorrow's Needs Act This bill amends the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to make it one of the purposes of the Act to provide financial and technical assistance to the states for the promotion of hunting and recreational shooting. The bill also prescribes a formula for the allocation of funds apportioned to a state that may be used for any activity or project to recruit or retain hunters and recreational shooters. In addition to other uses authorized under this bill, amounts apportioned to the states from any taxes on pistols, revolvers, bows, and arrows may be used for hunter recruitment and recreational shooter recruitment. The funds apportioned to a state for wildlife restoration management may be used for related public relations. If a state has not used all of the tax revenues apportioned to it for firearm and bow hunter education and safety program grants, it may use its remaining apportioned funds for the enhancement of hunter recruitment and recreational shooter recruitment. Up to $5 million of the revenues covered into the wildlife restoration fund in the Treasury from any tax imposed for a fiscal year on the sale of certain bows, arrows, and archery equipment shall be available to the Department of the Interior exclusively for making hunter recruitment and recreational shooter recruitment grants that promote a national hunting and shooting sport recruitment program, including related communication and outreach activities.
Title
Modernizing the Pittman-Robertson Fund for Tomorrow's Needs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8133) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2591. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8133-8134) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-08-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 695. |
2018-08-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-899. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1613 (Related) 2017-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Firearms and explosives
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection