US HB26 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Became Public Law No: 117-28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Became Public Law No: 117-28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021, to correct a provision on the prohibition on the use of a reverse auction, and for other purposes.
Title
Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-28. |
2021-07-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-07-21 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4860-4861) |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-01-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-01-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H68) |
2021-01-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 26. |
2021-01-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H68-69) |
2021-01-05 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1231 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.