US HB2605 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to (1) issue a final rule adding perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances with at least one fully fluorinated carbon atom to the list of hazardous air pollutants, and (2) revise the list of air pollution sources within 365 days after issuing the rule to include categories and subcategories of major sources and area sources of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances.
Title
PROTECT Act of 2019 Prevent Release Of Toxics Emissions, Contamination, and Transfer Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Related) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3227 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3227 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2605/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2605/BILLS-116hr2605ih.pdf |