US HB2613 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Financial Crimes Enforcement Network to report on emerging financial technologies—including artificial intelligence, digital identity, and blockchain technologies—and their use in law enforcement.
Title
Advancing Innovation to Assist Law Enforcement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7810-7811) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2613. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7810-7812) |
2019-09-19 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2514 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2513 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2513 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Department of the Treasury
Digital media
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Department of the Treasury
Digital media
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations