US HB2615 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the National Park Service (NPS) to convey specified federal lands located within the Gulf Islands National Seashore in Jackson County, Mississippi, to the Veterans of Foreign Wars Post 5699 in exchange for certain land located in such county. The values of the parcels to be exchanged shall be determined by an independent appraiser in accordance with nationally recognized appraisal standards. If the values of such parcels are not equal, their values shall be equalized through a cash payment or adjustments to their acreage. The NPS shall require the Post to pay or reimburse the costs incurred by the NPS to carry out such exchange. The bill subjects the exchange to valid existing rights. Land acquired by the United States under this bill shall be administered as part of the Gulf Islands National Seashore.
Title
Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment RC# 417 (Y: 375 N: 1 NV: 54 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-279. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-13 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 1 (Roll no. 417). (text: CR H9484-9485) |
2018-11-13 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-11-13 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 2615. |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Mr. Gosar moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9484-9485, H9501) |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6875-6876; text: CR S6875-6876) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 376. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-228. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-11-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9442) |
2017-11-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615. |
2017-11-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9442-9443) |
2017-11-28 | House | Mr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-09-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 216. |
2017-09-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-302. |
2017-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1260 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374.
Subjects
Gulf of Mexico
Land transfers
Mississippi
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Land transfers
Mississippi
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores