US HB2616 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Transportation to award grants to certain governmental entities and planning organizations to install electric vehicle charging infrastructure and hydrogen fueling infrastructure along designated alternative fuel corridors.
Title
Clean Corridors Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
SB674 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1707)
SB674 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1707)
Subjects
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Motor fuels
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Motor fuels
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2616/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2616/BILLS-116hr2616ih.pdf |