US HB2621 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Homeland Security, H. Rept. 116-88, Part II.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Homeland Security, H. Rept. 116-88, Part II.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Homeland Security to annually disseminate a terrorism threat assessment regarding ghost guns (i.e., guns without serial numbers) .
Title
Homeland Security Assessment of Terrorists
Sponsors
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Homeland Security, H. Rept. 116-88, Part II. |
2019-06-10 | House | PERMISSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL - Miss Rice (NY) asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Homeland Security be authorized to file a supplemental report on the bill, H.R. 2621. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 63. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-88. |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Terrorism
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Government information and archives
Terrorism