US HB2626 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PFAS Accountability Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PFAS Accountability Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-26HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-05-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-05-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1372 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback