US HB2628 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses dental care programs for veterans. Specifically, the bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to furnish administrative support to a dental care provider that provides services to a veteran that would not be covered by VA benefits. The bill also requires the VA to implement a pilot program to provide free outpatient dental services and treatment, and related dental appliances, to eligible veterans. Eligible veterans are those who are (1) enrolled in the VA health care system but are not eligible for VA dental care, (2) not receiving regular periodontal care, (3) between 40 and 70 years old, and (4) diagnosed with type 2 diabetes.
Title
VET CARE Act of 2019 Veterans Early Treatment for Chronic Ailment Resurgence through Examinations Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Dental care
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Home and outpatient care
Medical education
Veterans' medical care
Dental care
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Home and outpatient care
Medical education
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2628/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2628/BILLS-116hr2628ih.pdf |