US HB2629 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CARE for Reservists Act of 2019 Care And Readiness Enhancement for Reservists Act of 2019 This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide counseling without referral to any member of the reserve components of the Armed Forces who has a behavioral health condition or psychological trauma. Such counseling may include a comprehensive individual assessment, and outpatient services shall also be available. The bill authorizes the VA to furnish mental health services to reservists. The bill also expands specified VA programs to include reservists for the provision of (1) comprehensive suicide prevention, and (2) mental health treatment for veterans who served in classified missions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CARE for Reservists Act of 2019 Care And Readiness Enhancement for Reservists Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-05-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-05-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB711 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 538.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback