US HB2635 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes, within the Bureau of Prisons, an Office of Correctional Education. The office must provide educational services to incarcerated individuals in federal prisons and correctional institutions.
Title
PREP Act Promoting Reentry Through Education in Prisons Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1337 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Adult education and literacy
Census and government statistics
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Educational guidance
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Performance measurement
State and local government operations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Adult education and literacy
Census and government statistics
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Educational guidance
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Performance measurement
State and local government operations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2635/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2635/BILLS-116hr2635ih.pdf |