US HB2638 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to issue guidance on minimizing first responders' use of equipment (e.g., foam used to fight fires) that contains perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substances, commonly referred to as PFAS. These substances are man-made and may have adverse human health effects. A variety of products contain the compounds, such as nonstick cookware or weatherproof clothing.
Title
To direct the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to issue guidance on minimizing the use of firefighting foam containing PFAS, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Related) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Law enforcement officers
Worker safety and health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Law enforcement officers
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2638/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2638/BILLS-116hr2638ih.pdf |