US HB2647 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts the California flammability standard as the federal standard for upholstered furniture. To meet the standard, the upholstered furniture must past a specific test of the materials' ability to resist smoldering when a heat source is applied.
Title
SOFFA Act Safer Occupancy Furniture Flammability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10292) |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2647. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10292-10294) |
2019-12-16 | House | Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 277. |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-348. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1341 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 630.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
California
Commerce
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Federal preemption
Fires
Product safety and quality
State and local government operations
California
Commerce
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Federal preemption
Fires
Product safety and quality
State and local government operations