US HB265 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XI of the Social Security Act to eliminate the general Medicaid funding limitations for territories of the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Insular Area Medicaid Parity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-01-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E25) |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1228 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2713 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2713 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/265/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr265/BILLS-117hr265ih.pdf |