US HB2654 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands benefits, and increases specified taxes, related to the Old-Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance program. Changes to benefits include (1) increasing the primary insurance amount for certain beneficiaries, (2) calculating cost-of-living adjustments by using a price index that tracks the spending patterns of older consumers, and (3) establishing an alternative benefit for widows or widowers in two-income households. Changes to taxes include phasing out the cap on earnings subject to the Social Security payroll tax. Under current law, the maximum amount subject to this tax is $132,900.
Title
Strengthening Social Security Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2302 (Related) 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1132 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2389)
HB1540 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1132 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2389)
HB1540 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Aging
Census and government statistics
Employment taxes
Inflation and prices
Marriage and family status
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
Census and government statistics
Employment taxes
Inflation and prices
Marriage and family status
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2654/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2654/BILLS-116hr2654ih.pdf |