US HB2658 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-7)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Volunteer Firefighters and Emergency Responders Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude services rendered by bona-fide volunteers providing firefighting and prevention services, emergency medical services, or ambulance services to a state or local government or a tax-exempt charitable organization from the category of services usually rendered by an employee of an applicable large employer subject to the mandate to provide minimum essential health care coverage under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), thus exempting such employers from PPACA requirements with respect to such volunteers. The bill defines "bona fide volunteer" as an employee of any government entity and any tax-exempt charitable organization whose only compensation is in the form of: (1) reimbursement for (or reasonable allowance for) reasonable expenses incurred in the performance of volunteer services, or (2) reasonable benefits (including length-of-service awards) and nominal fees customarily paid by similar entities for the services of volunteers.
Title
Protecting Volunteer Firefighters and Emergency Responders Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. John Carney [D-DE] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ed Whitfield [R-KY] | Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] |
Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] |
Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB33 (Same As) 2015-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1191 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-17. (TXT | PDF)
SB420 (Same As) 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1191 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-17. (TXT | PDF)
SB420 (Same As) 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Taxation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2658/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2658/BILLS-114hr2658ih.pdf |