US HB266 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 12.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019 This bill provides FY2019 appropriations for the Department of the Interior, the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), and related agencies. The bill provides appropriations to Interior for the Bureau of Land Management, the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the National Park Service, the U.S. Geological Survey, the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, the Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, and the Bureau of Indian Affairs and Bureau of Indian Education. The bill provides appropriations to Interior for Departmental Offices, including the Office of the Secretary, Insular Affairs, the Office of the Solicitor, the Office of Inspector General, and the Office of the Special Trustee for American Indians. The bill provides appropriations to Interior for Department-Wide Programs, including Wildland Fire Management, the Central Hazardous Materials Fund, the Natural Resources Damage Assessment Fund, the Working Capital Fund, the Office of Natural Resources Revenue, and Payments In Lieu of Taxes (PILT). The bill also provides appropriations to the EPA and the Forest Service. Within the Department of Health and Human Services, the bill provides appropriations for the Indian Health Service, the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences, and the Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry. The bill provides appropriations for several related agencies, including the Executive Office of the President for the Council on Environmental Quality and the Office of Environmental Quality; the Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board; the Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation; the Institute of American Indian and Alaska Native Culture and Arts Development; the Smithsonian Institution; the National Gallery of Art; the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts; the Woodrow Wilson International Center for Scholars; the National Foundation on the Arts and Humanities, including the National Endowment for the Arts and the National Endowment for the Humanities; the Commission of Fine Arts; the Advisory Council on Historic Preservation; the National Capital Planning Commission; the U.S. Holocaust Memorial Museum; the Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Commission; the Women's Suffrage Centennial Commission; and the World War I Centennial Commission. Additionally, the bill sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this and other appropriations Acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-11 - House - On passage RC# 27 (Y: 240 N: 179 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 26 (Y: 190 N: 229 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 12.
2019-01-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2019-01-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-11HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 179 (Roll no. 27). (text: CR H469-487)
2019-01-11HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 229 (Roll no. 26).
2019-01-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H502-503)
2019-01-11HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion, and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Calvert demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit with instructions until a time to be announced.
2019-01-11HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2019-01-11HouseFloor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Calvert motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to decrease the Bureau of Land Management, Management of Lands and Resources account by $6 million and increase the Wildland Fire Management account by a similar amount; and to increase the Forest Service, Forest and Rangeland Research account by $15 million, and decrease the Capital Improvement and Maintenance account by a similar amount.
2019-01-11HouseMr. Calvert moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Appropriations. (text: CR H497)
2019-01-11HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-01-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 266.
2019-01-11HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 264, H.R. 265, H.R. 266 and H.R. 267. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rule provides one hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows one motion to commit on each bill. The rule waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of January 15, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
2019-01-11HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 28. (consideration: CR H469-498)
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
2019-01-08HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 28 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 264, H.R. 265, H.R. 266 and H.R. 267. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rule provides one hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows one motion to commit on each bill. The rule waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of January 15, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR28 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB21 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 5.
HB648 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
HR61 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback