US HB2680 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 the Special Diabetes Program for Indians. The program is administered by the Indian Health Service and provides funds to Indian health programs for diabetes prevention and treatment.
Title
Special Diabetes Programs for Indians Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB192 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2700 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2700 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Subjects
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2680/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2680/BILLS-116hr2680ih.pdf |