US HB269 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 13 (Y: 401 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 10.
2019-01-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2019-01-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 17 (Roll no. 13). (text: CR H237-262)
2019-01-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H275-276)
2019-01-08HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-01-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 269.
2019-01-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H237-266)
2019-01-08HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB11 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB345 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1379 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-22.
HB3443 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E971)

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Aging
Blood and blood diseases
Border security and unlawful immigration
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Chemical and biological weapons
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Disability and paralysis
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental health
First responders and emergency personnel
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
General health and health care finance matters
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government liability
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homeland security
Hospital care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Medical research
Military medicine
Minority health
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
Research and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Terrorism
User charges and fees
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Women's health
World health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback