US HB2700 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To incentivize low-cost drug options and generic competition, and to provide extensions for community health centers and the National Health Service Corps, and for other purposes.
Title
Lowering Prescription Drug Costs and Extending Community Health Centers and Other Public Health Priorities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB938 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 24.
HB965 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Supplemental report filed by the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 116-55, Part III.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1499 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
HB1943 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2668 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2680 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB192 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB340 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
HB3053 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB965 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Supplemental report filed by the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 116-55, Part III.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1499 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
HB1943 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2668 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2680 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB192 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB340 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
HB3053 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Consumer affairs
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Education programs funding
Family planning and birth control
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Medical education
Medical research
Minority health
National and community service
Prescription drugs
Product development and innovation
Sex and reproductive health
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Appropriations
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Consumer affairs
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Education programs funding
Family planning and birth control
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Medical education
Medical research
Minority health
National and community service
Prescription drugs
Product development and innovation
Sex and reproductive health
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2700/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2700/BILLS-116hr2700ih.pdf |