US HB2701 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award grants to support the access of marginalized youth to sexual health services, and for other purposes.
Title
Youth Access to Sexual Health Services Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1530 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6637 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
HB6637 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Cancer
Child health
Community life and organization
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Sex and reproductive health
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sexually transmitted diseases
Women's health
Cancer
Child health
Community life and organization
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Sex and reproductive health
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sexually transmitted diseases
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2701/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2701/BILLS-116hr2701ih.pdf |