US HB2702 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SBIR Commercialization Assistance Act of 2017 This bill amends the Small Business Act to require a federal agency required to have a Small Business Innovation Research (SBIR) program (covered agency) to implement a commercialization assistance pilot program (CAPP), under which an eligible entity may received a subsequent Phase II SBIR award through FY2022, unless the Small Business Administration determines that the agency already has a program sufficiently similar to a CAPP. An eligible entity is a small business concern that has received a Phase II award under an SBIR program and an additional Phase II SBIR award from the covered agency to which such small business concern is applying for the subsequent award. The Government Accountability Office must evaluate and report to Congress on CAPP, including a summary of activities and results and recommendations for CAPP improvement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SBIR Commercialization Assistance Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
2017-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2763 (Related) 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback