US HB2709 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Trade Act of 1974 to extend duty-free treatment under the Generalized System of Preferences (GSP) through September 30, 2015.
Title
To extend the Generalized System of Preferences.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Camp [R-MI] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2013-07-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1331 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2709/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2709/BILLS-113hr2709ih.pdf |