US HB2719 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the U.S. Postal Service to issue a Stamp Out Elder Abuse Semipostal Stamp, with the proceeds from the sale of the stamp transferred to (1) the Department of Justice for specified purposes, including prevention and education regarding elder abuse, data collection, and victim services; and (2) the Department of Health and Human Services for purposes of elder justice activities.
Title
Stamp Out Elder Abuse Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1784 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3323-3324)
Subjects
Aging
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Government operations and politics
Postal service
U.S. Postal Service
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Government operations and politics
Postal service
U.S. Postal Service
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2719/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2719/BILLS-116hr2719ih.pdf |