US HB2720 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), in coordination with certain HHS components, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, and the Department of Education, to award grants for comprehensive sex education for adolescents. It also awards grants for comprehensive sex education provided by institutions of higher education and for training faculty and staff to teach comprehensive sex education to adolescents. Comprehensive sex education programs may include, among other things, instruction that addresses the physical, mental, emotional, and social dimensions of human sexuality and approaches designed to motivate and assist students to maintain and improve their sexual health, prevent disease and reduce sexual health-related risk behaviors. Grant funds generally may not be used for specified purposes, including to (1) withhold specified health information related to HIV, (2) provide medically inaccurate information, or (3) promote gender or racial stereotypes. The bill also revises requirements and eliminates prohibitions regarding the content of educational programs funded through the HIV/AIDS prevention program, repeals the prohibition on using funds for materials or programs that promote or encourage sexual activity and contraceptive distribution in school, and repeals the Abstinence Only Until Marriage program.
Title
Real Education for Healthy Youth Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1524 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6637 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
HB6637 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Appropriations
Child care and development
Child health
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Family planning and birth control
Family relationships
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
HIV/AIDS
Indian social and development programs
Medical research
Minority education
Sex and reproductive health
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sexually transmitted diseases
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's health
Appropriations
Child care and development
Child health
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Family planning and birth control
Family relationships
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
HIV/AIDS
Indian social and development programs
Medical research
Minority education
Sex and reproductive health
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sexually transmitted diseases
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2720/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2720/BILLS-116hr2720ih.pdf |