US HB2726 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits smoking on board National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak) trains, including smoking electronic cigarettes.
Title
Banning Smoking on Amtrak Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 12/16/2019 CR H10275) |
2019-12-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10602) |
2019-12-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Norton objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2726. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10275-10276) |
2019-12-16 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-09-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157. |
2019-09-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-199. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-26 | House | Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E586) |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2768 (Same As) 2019-10-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7095 (Related) 2020-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7095 (Related) 2020-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security