US HB2739 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-15)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB846 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1663 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback