US HB2741 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Leading Infrastructure for Tomorrow's America Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leading Infrastructure for Tomorrow's America Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-06-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2019 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB2041 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2043 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2044 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB2088 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2119 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2533 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB2665 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2760 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB2906 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB1479 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects

Administrative Conference of the U.S.
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Aging
Air quality
Alabama
Alternative and renewable resources
Atmospheric science and weather
Building construction
Buy American requirements
Child health
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Community life and organization
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Contracts and agency
Department of Energy
Economic development
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency communications systems
Employment and training programs
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Federal-Indian relations
Florida
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Libraries and archives
Licensing and registrations
Lighting, heating, cooling
Low- and moderate-income housing
Maine
Massachusetts
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
New Hampshire
New Jersey
New York State
North Carolina
Oil and gas
Pennsylvania
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Rhode Island
Rural conditions and development
South Carolina
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Strategic materials and reserves
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Terrorism
Transportation and public works
Unemployment
Vermont
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women in business
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback