US HB2744 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-334.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-334.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to use various markings, including USAID logos and the U.S. flag, to identify overseas USAID programs. The USAID Inspector General shall submit to Congress an audit of compliance with USAID branding requirements by partner entities implementing USAID programs. Current law requires overseas USAID programs to be identified as American Aid. USAID guidelines authorize the use of the U.S. flag only in certain situations.
Title
USAID Branding Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 475 (Y: 414 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-334. |
2021-01-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-01-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-31 | House | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9170) |
2020-12-31 | House | Mrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 2744, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9170) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1082; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1082) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 369. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 1 (Roll no. 475). (text: CR H5786) |
2019-07-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5812-5813) |
2019-07-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2744. |
2019-07-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5786-5787) |
2019-07-15 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2691 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Marketing and advertising
National symbols
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Marketing and advertising
National symbols
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)