US HB2752 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish medically necessary transportation for newborn children of certain women veterans.
Title
VA Newborn Emergency Treatment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB318 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
SB3182 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 415.
SB3182 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 415.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Transportation costs
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Transportation costs
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2752/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2752/BILLS-116hr2752ih.pdf |