US HB276 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to ensure reliable air service in American Samoa. (Sec. 1) This bill declares that in order to provide and sustain air transportation in American Samoa between the islands of Tutuila and Manu'a, the Department of Transportation may renew a foreign air carrier's emergency air transportation exemption every 180 days (instead of the current 30-day renewal period that applies to other areas).
Title
A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to ensure reliable air service in American Samoa.
Sponsors
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-01-31 | House | Mr. LoBiondo asked unanimous consent to amend the title to H.R. 276. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-31 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-31 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H771) |
2017-01-31 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 276. |
2017-01-31 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H771-772) |
2017-01-31 | House | Mr. LoBiondo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2348 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2348 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
SB2348 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
Subjects
American Samoa
Aviation and airports
Transportation and public works
U.S. territories and protectorates
Aviation and airports
Transportation and public works
U.S. territories and protectorates