US HB2763 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Innovation Research and Small Business Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 2017 This bill amends the Small Business Act to require: the Small Business Administration's (SBA's) annual report on the Small Business Information and Research (SBIR) and Small Business Technology Transfer (STTR) programs to be submitted by December 31, and each federal agency required to establish an SBIR program to submit its annual report on such program by March 30. The bill requires (current law authorizes) the Department of Defense (DOD), for any contract under the Commercial Readiness Program with a value of at least $100 million, to: establish goals for the transition of Phase III technologies in subcontracting plans, and require a prime contractor to report the number and dollar amount of contacts entered into for Phase III SBIR or STTR projects. The bill authorizes all agencies participating in the SBIR program, during FY2018-FY2022, to provide SBIR Phase II awards for a project to a small business concern without regard to whether such concern was provided a Phase I award for such project. The bill changes the temporary pilot program that a covered agency may establish for the allocation of SBIR and STTR program funds for awards for technology development, testing, evaluation, and commercialization assistance for SBIR and STTR phase II technologies, or to support the progress of research, research and development, and commercialization conducted under such programs to phase III, to a permanent Civilian Agency Commercialization Readiness Program. The bill extends until September 30, 2022, the deadline until which the SBA shall allow each agency required to conduct an SBIR program to use not more than 3% of program funds for administrative, oversight, and contract processing costs.
Title
Small Business Innovation Research and Small Business Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2017-10-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7939-7942) |
2017-10-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2763. |
2017-10-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7939-7945) |
2017-10-11 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223. |
2017-09-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-313, Part II. |
2017-09-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-313, Part I. |
2017-06-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-06-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2767 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB2789 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB2702 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB2780 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
SB2419 (Related) 2018-12-21 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-454.
HB2789 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB2702 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB2780 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
SB2419 (Related) 2018-12-21 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-454.
Subjects
Commerce
Federal officials
Intellectual property
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization
Federal officials
Intellectual property
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization