US HB2763 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) from implementing, administering, enforcing, or in any manner making effective the proposed rule titled Housing and Community Development Act of 1980: Verification of Eligible Status, issued on May 10, 2019, or any final rule based substantially on such proposed rule. The rule requires that every member of a household receiving HUD housing assistance must be a U.S. citizen or noncitizen with eligible immigration status.
Title
Keeping Families Together Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154. |
2019-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-196. |
2019-06-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1904 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3055 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-69. (TXT | PDF)
HB3055 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-69. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Immigration status and procedures
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Immigration status and procedures
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public housing