US HB279 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 95-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide lasting protection for inventoried roadless areas within the National Forest System.
Title
Roadless Area Conservation Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB877 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/279/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr279/BILLS-117hr279ih.pdf |