US HB2791 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish the Advisory Committee on Tribal and Indian Affairs to advise the VA on matters relating to Native American tribes, tribal organizations, and Native American veterans.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Tribal Advisory Committee Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB524 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal-Indian relations
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Federal-Indian relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2791/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2791/BILLS-116hr2791ih.pdf |