US HB2795 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the conservation and restoration of habitats that facilitate the movement of certain native species (e.g., fish, wildlife, or plant species) that may be at risk due to habitat loss or fragmentation. The bill establishes a National Wildlife Corridor System and provides for the designation and management of such corridors on federal land and water. A corridor means a feature of the landscape or seascape that (1) provides habitat or ecological connectivity, and (2) allows for movement or dispersal of native fish, wildlife, or plants. Indian tribes may nominate a corridor within their land to be included in a Tribal Wildlife Corridor. In addition, the bill establishes a Wildlife Corridors Stewardship Fund to receive donations for the management and protection of the corridors. It also establishes a wildlife movement grant program to encourage the passage of native fish, wildlife, or plant species across a landscape or seascape. The National Coordination Committee, established by this bill, must recommend projects to fund under the grant program. The committee must also develop standards for regional wildlife movement plans to allow for better cross-regional collaboration. No fewer than four regional wildlife movement councils must be established. Among other things, the councils must submit to the committee regional wildlife movement plans as well as lists of funding priorities. Finally, the U.S. Geological Survey must establish a National Wildlife Corridors Database.
Title
Wildlife Corridors Conservation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] |
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456. |
2020-10-09 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2020-10-09 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2020-10-09 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2020-10-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-558, Part I. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15. |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1499 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB5179 (Related) 2020-10-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
SB2891 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB5179 (Related) 2020-10-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
SB2891 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Birds
Charitable contributions
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Genetics
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military facilities and property
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Birds
Charitable contributions
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Genetics
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Military facilities and property
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection