US HB2815 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-19)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alters funding provisions, and establishes additional reporting requirements, relating to the Teaching Health Center Graduate Medical Education Program, which is administered by the Health Resources and Services Administration (HRSA). The program supports training for primary-care-physician and dental residents at community-based clinics. The bill (1) establishes certain parameters for payments to approved and newly approved graduate medical-residency training programs, and (2) requires HRSA to publish a report regarding new and expanded programs.
Title
Training the Next Generation of Primary Care Doctors Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB304 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S804-807)
SB1191 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1191 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Aging
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Government information and archives
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2815/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2815/BILLS-116hr2815ih.pdf |