US HB2816 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Vietnam-Era Veterans Hepatitis C Testing Enhancement Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a one-year pilot program to make hepatitis C testing available to certain veterans at events organized by veterans service organizations. To be eligible, a veteran must have served in the active military, naval, or air service between February 28, 1961, and May 7, 1975, and must have been discharged or released under conditions other than dishonorable. The program shall be carried out in two rural and three urban Veterans Integrated Service Networks (regional VA health care administrative areas). The VA shall expand the program to all networks if at least 350,000 veterans are tested for hepatitis C by the program's termination date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vietnam-Era Veterans Hepatitis C Testing Enhancement Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-03-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-12HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-05-16HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback