US HB2817 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit taking minors across State lines in circumvention of laws requiring the involvement of parents in abortion decisions.
Title
Child Custody Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB611 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB119 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB194 (Same As) 2019-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB119 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB194 (Same As) 2019-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Abortion
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Family relationships
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Teenage pregnancy
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Family relationships
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Teenage pregnancy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2817/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2817/BILLS-116hr2817ih.pdf |