US HB2828 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 74-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Energy Innovation Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide incentives for energy production and conservation, including by: (1) allowing accelerated depreciation of cellulosic biomass ethanol plant property, coal-to-liquid plant property, dedicated ethanol distribution lines, solar and fuel cell property, smart electric meters, and certain clean coal power plants; (2) making permanent tax credits for increasing research activities, nonbusiness energy property, gas produced from biomass, and synthetic fuels produced from coal; (3) allowing new tax credits for pollution abatement equipment, the manufacture of natural gas-powered vehicles, nuclear power manufacturing and construction projects, and carbon dioxide capture from industrial sources; (4) extending the income tax credits for the production of electricity from renewable resources, for energy efficient home expenditures, and for the conversion of motor vehicles to natural gas powered vehicles; (5) extending the excise tax credit for alternative fuels and alternative fuel vehicles; (6) extending the tax deduction for energy efficient commercial buildings; and (7) increasing the tax credit for carbon dioxide sequestration. Establishes: (1) a pilot project for leasing federal lands for the development of commercial photovoltaic and concentrating solar power energy systems; (2) an Alternative Fuel Vehicle Innovation Prize; (3) the Office of the Federal Oil and Gas Permit Coordinator; and (4) the Deficit Reduction Trust Fund into which Outer Continental Shelf (OCS) receipts derived from leases of tracts available as a result of this Act shall be deposited. Amends the Clean Air Act to: (1) exclude from the meaning of "air pollutant" carbon dioxide, water vapor, methane, nitrous oxide, hydrofluorocarbons, perfluorocarbons, and sulfur hexafluoride; and (2) revise the renewable fuel standard. Repeals: (1) the authorization to withdraw or reissue the "Interagency Cooperation under the Endangered Species Act" rule and the "Endangered and Threatened Wildlife and Plants: Special Rule for Polar Bear"; (2) specified energy efficiency standards for lamps; (3) the prohibition against oil and gas leasing in certain areas of Gulf of Mexico and oil and gas production in the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge; (4) the limitation on using funds for implementing a commercial leasing program for oil shale resources on public land; and (5) the Oil Shale, Tar Sands, and Other Strategic Unconventional Fuels Act of 2005. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) establish the Alaska Offshore Continental Shelf Coordination Office; and (2) assess the capacity of a storage formation that can retain carbon dioxide. Revises the Coal-to-Liquid Fuel Program. Sets forth provisions concerning loans for the construction of coal-to-liquid facilities and technology. Requires the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to: (1) conduct a natural gas vehicle research, development, and demonstration program; and (2) audit coal-fired electric generation facilities. Provides for: (1) oil and gas leasing in the OCS, the Atlantic Planning Area, the Pacific Planning Area, the Alaska Planning Area, the Gulf of Mexico Planning Area, and the Coastal Plain; (2) the leasing of oil shale resources; and (3) the treatment of revenues received through oil shale or tar sand leases. Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to designate certain Coastal Plain lands, including the Sadlerochit Spring area, as Special Areas requiring special management and regulatory protection. Requires the DOE Secretary to implement a Nuclear Power 2010 Program and establish a National Nuclear Energy Council. Authorizes the DOE Secretary to use amounts in the Waste Fund to make grants or contracts with private sector entities for the recycling of spent nuclear fuel. Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to conduct a research and demonstration program to evaluate the air quality benefits of ultra-clean Fischer-Tropsch transportation fuel.
Title
American Energy Innovation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-18 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. | |
2009-06-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to House Rules | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to House Science and Technology | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to House Natural Resources | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Energy and Commerce, Science and Technology, Rules, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2300 (Related) 2009-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Budget deficits and national debt
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Civil actions and liability
Climate change
Coal
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
District of Columbia
Electric power generation and transmission
Endangered and threatened species
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy revenues and royalties
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal appellate courts
Federal district courts
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Industrial facilities
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor fuels
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public contracts and procurement
Radioactive wastes and releases
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Budget deficits and national debt
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Civil actions and liability
Climate change
Coal
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
District of Columbia
Electric power generation and transmission
Endangered and threatened species
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy revenues and royalties
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal appellate courts
Federal district courts
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Industrial facilities
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial review and appeals
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor fuels
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public contracts and procurement
Radioactive wastes and releases
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2828/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2828/BILLS-111hr2828ih.pdf |