US HB2865 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a grant program for states to implement evidence-based programs designed to reduce crime rates and incarcerations.
Title
Reverse Mass Incarceration Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1557 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Law enforcement administration and funding
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Law enforcement administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2865/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2865/BILLS-116hr2865ih.pdf |