US HB2874 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-28 - Provisions of measure incorporated into H.R. 3949.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-28 - Provisions of measure incorporated into H.R. 3949.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Helping Active Duty Deployed Act of 2009 - Amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to prohibit a cell phone company from charging an early termination penalty for a cellular telephone contract entered into on behalf of a service member who has received orders for foreign deployment or for permanent change of station within the United States. (Current law provides such protection for a contract entered into by the service member.) Revises provisions concerning arrearages and other obligations to prohibit a lessor from charging an early termination charge with respect to a residential, professional, business, or agricultural rental lease or a motor vehicle lease entered into by a person who subsequently enters military service, or for a service member who has received orders for permanent change of station or for deployment in support of a military operation. States that: (1) lease amounts for a period preceding the lease termination shall be paid on a prorated basis; and (2) other unpaid lease charges shall be paid by the lessee. Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require an institution of higher education to refund the tuition and fees paid by a student whose absence is due to military service for the payment period or period of enrollment for which such student did not receive academic credit as a result of such absence.
Title
Helping Active Duty Deployed Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] |
Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Thomas Perriello [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-28 | Provisions of measure incorporated into H.R. 3949. | |
2009-10-08 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . | |
2009-10-08 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-09-24 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-06-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2009-06-15 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-06-15 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-06-15 | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | |
2009-06-15 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1428) |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Contracts and agency
Higher education
Housing finance and home ownership
Military personnel and dependents
Motor vehicles
Student aid and college costs
Telephone and wireless communication
User charges and fees
Contracts and agency
Higher education
Housing finance and home ownership
Military personnel and dependents
Motor vehicles
Student aid and college costs
Telephone and wireless communication
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2874/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2874/BILLS-111hr2874ih.pdf |