US HB2877 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the E-3 visa program to cover Irish nationals. The E-3 visa is a nonimmigrant visa currently only available to Australian nationals coming to the United States for employment in a specialty occupation. For Irish E-3 initial applications, the Department of State may approve each fiscal year no more than 10,500 minus the number of Australian initial applications approved the previous fiscal year.
Title
To add Ireland to the E-3 nonimmigrant visa program.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1541) |
2020-03-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2877. |
2020-03-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1541-1542) |
2020-03-09 | House | Ms. Scanlon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2418 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB3134 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3134 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.