US HB2881 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the President, in consultation with relevant federal agencies, to develop (1) a strategy to secure and protect U.S. fifth and future generations (5G) systems and infrastructure, and (2) an implementation plan for the strategy. Such strategy shall (1) ensure the security of 5G wireless communications systems and infrastructure within the United States; (2) assist mutual defense treaty allies, strategic partners, and other countries in maximizing the security of 5G systems and infrastructure; and (3) protect the competitiveness of U.S. companies, the privacy of U.S. consumers, and the impartiality of standards-setting bodies.
Title
Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 4 (Y: 413 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 403. |
2020-01-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 3 (Roll no. 4). (text: CR H44) |
2020-01-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H50-51) |
2020-01-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-01-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2881. |
2020-01-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H43-46) |
2020-01-08 | House | Mr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-01-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 292. |
2020-01-07 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2020-01-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-369, Part I. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-11-14 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB893 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alliances
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Research and development
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication
Alliances
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Research and development
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication